Home › Community › Questions & Answers › Mental Math Q & A › multiplying 4 digits by 11 with carry over numbers

- This topic has 1 reply, 2 voices, and was last updated February 13, 2020 at 1:48 am by Abhishek R.

- AuthorPosts
- February 13, 2020 at 1:48 am #10392
Hi! I just started this book today, finished the exercises in chapter 5. I got some of the questions wrong with 4 digits and carry over (I am always off on one of the two middle digits). Do you have examples for me? I only see 3 digit examples in the book.

February 13, 2020 at 1:58 am #10393The steps are the same as 3 digit multiplication by 11.

Here is an example of 4 digit multiplication.

5763 x 11

The first digit becomes the first digit of the answer

5763 x 11 = 5 _ _ _ _

Adding the next two digits 5 + 7 gives 12. The second digit 2 in 12 becomes the second digit of the answer.

5763 x 11 = 5 2 _ _ _

Since 12 has two digits, we carry over the first digit 1 so 5 becomes 6.

5763 x 11 = 6 2 _ _ _

Adding the next two digits 7 + 6 we get 13. The second 3 in 13 becomes the third digit of the answer

5763 x 11 = 6 2 3 _ _

Since 13 has two digits, we carry over the first digit 1 so 2 becomes 3.

5763 x 11 = 6 3 3 _ _

Adding the next two digits 6 + 3 we get 9 which becomes the next digit of the answer.

5763 x 11 = 6 3 3 9 _

The last digit 3 becomes the last digit of the answer.

5763 x 11 = 6 3 3 9 3

Let me know if this example clarifies.

- AuthorPosts

- You must be logged in to reply to this topic.