Multiplication by 11

Home Community Questions & Answers Mental Math Q & A Multiplication by 11

Viewing 4 posts - 1 through 4 (of 4 total)
  • Author
    Posts
  • #5160
    Susan
    Participant
    • Topics: 1
    • Replies: 1

    I don’t get #14. I keep getting 59049. What am I doing wrong?

    #5162
    Ofpad
    Participant
    • Topics: 0
    • Replies: 158

    Hi Susan,

    I am guessing you are referring to the 14th problem – 5459 x 11

    These are the exact steps

    Step 1 – First digit is placed as left hand number of the answer. 

    5459 x 11 = 5_ _ _ _ (5 is the first digit)

    Step 2 – Each successive digit added to its neighbor the left.

    Step 2.A) 5 + 4 = 9

    5459 x 11 = 59_ _ _

    Step 2.B) 4 + 5 = 9

    5459 x 11 = 599_ _

    Step 2.C) 5 + 9 = 14

    5459 x 11 = 6004_ (Note 1 in 14 is carried over)

    Step 3 – Last digit becomes last number of the answer.

    5459 x 11 = 60049

    The reason why you are getting 59049 is because you are not carrying over the 1 completely across all three digits (599 in this case). When you need to carry over across multiple digits, visualize adding 1 to multiple digits like 599, instead of adding to a single digit 9. When you do that you only have to mentally carry over the number once, instead of carrying over the number 3 times across each individual digit.

    Hope this breakdown of the steps clarifies. Please let me know if you need any further clarification and I will be happy to help.

    #5164
    Susan
    Participant
    • Topics: 1
    • Replies: 1

    Thanks! I am enjoying this course.

    #5166
    Ofpad
    Participant
    • Topics: 0
    • Replies: 158

    Glad to hear that. Please do leave a review if you find the course useful 🙂

Viewing 4 posts - 1 through 4 (of 4 total)
  • You must be logged in to reply to this topic.