5459 x 11

Viewing 2 posts - 1 through 2 (of 2 total)
  • Author
    Posts
  • #5038
    Hamza
    Participant
    • Topics: 1
    • Replies: 0

    How do you solve this problem? When I did it, I ended up getting 59104, but the answer is 60049. What did I do wrong?

    #5040
    Ofpad
    Participant
    • Topics: 0
    • Replies: 158

    Hi Hamza,

    You are not carrying over 1 across.

    5459 x 11 =

    First digit 5 becomes the first digit of the answer so

    5459 x 11 = 5 _ _ _ _

    Adding the first two digits we get 5 + 4 = 9

    5459 x 11 = 5 9 _ _ _

    Adding the next two digits we get 4 + 5 = 9

    5459 x 11 = 5 9 9 _ _

    Adding the next two digits we get 5 + 9 = 14

    Since 14 has two digits we need to carry over the 1 so 599 becomes 600

    5459 x 11 = 6 0 0 4 _

    This is where you are making the mistake. You are not carrying the number across. You are adding it only to 9. Another way to think about it is when you add 1 to 9 you get 10 which is also a two digit number, so you have to carry over the number again to the next 9. This will also result in two digit number so you carry over the 1 to the next 5 to make it 6.

    Finally 9 becomes the last digit of the answer.

    5459 x 11 = 6 0 0 4 9

    Let me know if this clarifies.

     

Viewing 2 posts - 1 through 2 (of 2 total)
  • You must be logged in to reply to this topic.