#10 I get 39544 and not 39534

Home Community Questions & Answers Mental Math Q & A #10 I get 39544 and not 39534

Viewing 2 posts - 1 through 2 (of 2 total)
  • Author
    Posts
  • #4989
    Dale
    Participant
    • Topics: 1
    • Replies: 0

    From Lecture 4

    #4992
    Ofpad
    Participant
    • Topics: 0
    • Replies: 158

    Hi Dale,

    Sorry about the late reply. Somehow missed the question.

    Here are the steps:

    3594 x 11 = _ _ _ _ _

    1. First digit becomes the first digit of the answer.
    So 3 becomes the first digit of the answer.

    3594 x 11 = 3 _ _ _ _

    2. Each digit needs to be added to its neighbor on the right.

    First 3 + 5 = 8

    3594 x 11 = 3 8 _ _ _

    Next 5 + 9 = 14. Carrying over 1, the 8 becomes 9.

    3594 x 11 = 3 9 4 _ _

    Next 9 + 4 = 13. Carrying over 1, the 4 becomes 5.

    3594 x 11 = 3 9 5 3 _

    3. Last digit becomes the last digit of the answer.

    4 becomes the last digit of the answer.

    3594 x 11 = 3 9 5 3 4.

    Hope this clarifies.

Viewing 2 posts - 1 through 2 (of 2 total)
  • You must be logged in to reply to this topic.